Announcement Title | Change - Announcement of Cessation |
Date & Time of Broadcast | Dec 8, 2017 18:10 |
Status | New |
Announcement Sub Title | Resignation of Head, Corporate Finance & Treasury |
Announcement Reference | SG171208OTHRJE0Q |
Submitted By (Co./ Ind. Name) | Koh Kai Kheng Irene |
Designation | Group Financial Controller |
Effective Date and Time of the event | 08/12/2017 17:00:00 |
Description (Please provide a detailed description of the event in the box below) | Resignation of Head, Corporate Finance & Treasury |
Additional Details | |
Name Of Person | Toh Sock Kuan |
Age | 45 |
Is effective date of cessation known? | Yes |
If yes, please provide the date | 15/12/2017 |
Detailed Reason (s) for cessation | To pursue other career opportunity. The Board wishes to express their appreciation to Ms Toh for her contributions during her tenure of service. |
Are there any unresolved differences in opinion on material matters between the person and the board of directors, including matters which would have a material impact on the group or its financial reporting? | No |
Is there any matter in relation to the cessation that needs to be brought to the attention of the shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Any other relevant information to be provided to shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Date of Appointment to current position | 01/03/2016 |
Does the AC have a minimum of 3 members (taking into account this cessation)? | Yes |
Number of Independent Directors currently resident in Singapore (taking into account this cessation) | 3 |
Number of cessations of appointments specified in Listing Rule 704 (7) or Catalist Rule 704 (6) over the past 12 months | 1 |
Job Title (e.g. Lead ID, AC Chairman, AC Member etc.) | Head, Corporate Finance & Treasury |
Role and responsibilities | Overall responsible for corporate finance and treasury management functions, including matters relating to the Company's debt and equity fund raising and managing investor relations of the Group |
Familial relationship with any director and/ or substantial shareholder of the listed issuer or of any of its principal subsidiaries | No |
Shareholding interest in the listed issuer and its subsidiaries? | No |
Past (for the last 5 years) | Nil |
Present | Nil |